Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Pasca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1778BornNapoli
20 Dec 180022.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 181941.2SelectedBishop of Boiano, Italy
4 Jun 181941.3ConfirmedBishop of Boiano, Italy
6 Jun 181941.3Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
4 May 182850.2SelectedBishop of Nola, Italy
23 Jun 182850.4ConfirmedBishop of Nola, Italy
9 Feb 185577.0ResignedBishop of Nola, Italy
3 Oct 185577.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Pasca
Bishop Gennaro Pasca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nola

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 114, and Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1819, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 May 2016