Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Pappalardo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Conza e Campagna, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1800Born
12 Jun 182423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
7 Oct 184847.8SelectedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
22 Dec 184848.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
10 Jun 184948.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy
19 Dec 184949.0ResignedArchbishop of Conza e Campagna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pappalardo
Archbishop Giuseppe Pappalardo (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Conza e Campagna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 219
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018