Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Acciardi

Deceased

Bishop of Anglona-Tursi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1809BornNapoli
22 Dec 183223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
20 Apr 184939.5AppointedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
10 Jun 184939.6Ordained BishopBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy
14 Mar 188373.4DiedBishop of Anglona-Tursi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Acciardi (VIAF: 260737546)
Bishop Gennaro Acciardi (born , died ) Bishop of Anglona-Tursi

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 103
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016