Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giandomenico Falcone

Deceased

Prelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

Titular Bishop of Eumenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1810Born
23 Mar 183322.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 185847.8AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
25 Jun 185847.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
1 Aug 185847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia
1863¹52.4DiedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giandomenico Falcone
Bishop Giandomenico Falcone (born , died 1863) Prelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapracotta, Diocese of Trivento
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017