Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Carbonelli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Bethsaida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1798³Born
21 Dec 182224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
20 May 185051.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
20 May 185051.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
16 Jun 185051.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethsaida
21 Nov 186567.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Carbonelli (VIAF: 310720479)
Bishop Raffaele Carbonelli (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli
Ordained BishopCathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 148
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1850, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017