Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Michele Salzano, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1807BornNapoli
19 Jan 185446.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
19 Jan 185446.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
12 Mar 185446.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
22 Dec 187366.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
12 Sep 189083.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Michele Salzano (VIAF: 39726342)
Archbishop Tommaso Michele Salzano O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 256, and Page 534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1854, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 Dec 2016