Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Maria Nisio, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ariano

Titular Archbishop of Amorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1824BornMolfetta
8 Apr 184824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
17 Sep 187551.6AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy
3 Oct 187551.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
10 Jun 187652.3ResignedBishop of Ariano, Italy
26 Jun 187652.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amorium
7 Oct 188864.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Maria Nisio:
Archbishop Salvatore Maria Nisio Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ariano

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 96, and Page 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013