Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola de Simone

Deceased

Bishop of Bova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1820BornMesoraca
1 Jun 184424.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 187756.9AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
22 Apr 187757.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
8 Jul 189575.2DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola de Simone:
Bishop Nicola de Simone (born , died ) Bishop of Bova

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013