Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Lawrence Burgess

Deceased

Bishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1791Born
13 Oct 180716.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1814²22.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1830²38.2IncardinatedPriest of Western District, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 185159.7AppointedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
27 Jul 185159.8Ordained BishopBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
27 Nov 185463.1DiedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Lawrence Burgess (VIAF: 75846773)
Bishop Thomas Lawrence Burgess (born , died ) Bishop of Clifton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClayton Green, Chorley, Lancashire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained BishopSt. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Death PlaceWestbury-on-Trym, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England
Buried Place (Original)Twelve Apostles, Pro-Cathedral, Clifton, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England
Buried Place (Current)Chapel Crypt, Holy Souls, Cemetery, Arnos Vale, Bristol, Diocese of Clifton, England

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bp/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 210
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 51
  • inca: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • mn/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 38
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast