Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Benedict Scarisbrick, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port-Louis, Mauritius

Titular Archbishop of Cyzicus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1828Born
9 Nov 184921.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jun 185021.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Dec 187143.4AppointedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
11 Feb 187243.5Ordained BishopBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
27 Sep 188759.2ResignedBishop of Port-Louis, Mauritius
11 Sep 188860.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyzicus
7 May 190879.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Port-Louis, Mauritius

MicroData Summary for William Benedict Scarisbrick (VIAF: 315694339)
Archbishop William Benedict Scarisbrick O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port-Louis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Liverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 237, and Page 466
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017