Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Salvador D’Souza

Deceased

Bishop of Baroda, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1912Born
27 Nov 193826.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 196654.6AppointedBishop of Baroda, India
30 Nov 196654.7Ordained BishopBishop of Baroda, India
19 Jan 198673.9DiedBishop of Baroda, India

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Salvador D’Souza
Bishop Ignatius Salvador D’Souza (born , died ) Bishop of Baroda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalangute

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018