Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Colgan

Deceased

Archbishop of Madras, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1824Born
1846¹21.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 188258.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Madras, India
19 May 188258.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
24 Aug 188258.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
25 Nov 188662.6AppointedArchbishop of Madras, India
13 Feb 191186.8DiedArchbishop of Madras, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Colgan
Archbishop Joseph Colgan (born , died ) Archbishop of Madras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonore, Ireland
Ordained BishopMadras, Vicariate Apostolic of Madras

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 133, and Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017