Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Clerc, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vizagapatam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1847BornBallaison, France
25 May 187225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
19 Feb 189143.9AppointedBishop of Vizagapatam, India
26 Jul 189144.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vizagapatam, India
18 Jun 192679.2DiedBishop of Vizagapatam, India

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Clerc:
Bishop Jean-Marie Clerc M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Vizagapatam

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 594

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013