Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Etienne Coppel, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nagpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1867Born
6 Jul 189023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
22 Jun 190740.4AppointedBishop of Nagpur, India
15 Sep 190740.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nagpur, India
16 Mar 193366.1DiedBishop of Nagpur, India

MicroData Summary for François-Etienne Coppel
Bishop François-Etienne Coppel M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Nagpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLes-Gêts, France

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017