Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Yves-Marie Coadou, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mysore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1819BornLocronan, France
10 May 184425.3ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
17 May 184526.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
27 Jul 188061.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mysore, India
27 Jul 188061.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
10 Oct 188061.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
25 Nov 188667.9AppointedBishop of Mysore, India
14 Sep 189071.7DiedBishop of Mysore, India

MicroData Summary for Jean-Yves-Marie Coadou:
Bishop Jean-Yves-Marie Coadou M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Mysore

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 203, and Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013