Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmond Hyacinthe Theodore Joseph Dumont

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1828Born
15 Apr 185425.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 187244.1AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
2 Feb 187344.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
22 Nov 187951.0ResignedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
20 Nov 189264.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Edmond Hyacinthe Theodore Joseph Dumont
Bishop Edmond Hyacinthe Theodore Joseph Dumont (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Amand, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Tournai, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 559
  • c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018