Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Théodore-Joseph Gravez

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1810BornSivry
20 Dec 183424.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 186757.3AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
2 Feb 186857.4Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
16 Jul 188372.8DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Théodore-Joseph Gravez:
Bishop Théodore-Joseph Gravez (born , died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 400
  • c1+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014