Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leone Proserpio, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Calicut, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1878Born
26 Oct 191032.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Dec 193759.5AppointedBishop of Calicut, India
13 Mar 193859.8Ordained BishopBishop of Calicut, India
8 Sep 194567.3DiedBishop of Calicut, India

MicroData Summary for Leone Proserpio
Bishop Leone Proserpio S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Calicut

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlba Pompeia, Diocese of Alba (Pompea), Italy

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast