Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Anthony Vazhapilly

Bishop Emeritus of Mysore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1940 Born
2 Dec 196424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
14 Jan 200362.7AppointedBishop of Mysore, India
25 Mar 200362.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mysore, India
25 Jan 201776.7RetiredBishop of Mysore, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Anthony Vazhapilly
Bishop Thomas Anthony Vazhapilly (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mysore

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeringottukara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mysore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 490
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,357
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017