Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Swamy Thomasappa

Bishop of Chikmagalur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1951 Born
20 May 198433.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bangalore, India
2 Dec 200655.8AppointedBishop of Chikmagalur, India
6 Feb 200755.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chikmagalur, India

MicroData Summary for Anthony Swamy Thomasappa
Bishop Anthony Swamy Thomasappa (born ) Bishop of Chikmagalur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMariannapalaya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chikmagalur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Feb 2017