Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Nellaiparambil

Bishop of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1971 Born
8 Apr 199927.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India
30 Aug 201948.2AppointedBishop of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India
1 Nov 201948.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Vincent Nellaiparambil
Bishop Vincent Nellaiparambil (born ) Bishop of Bijnor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArippalam
Ordained BishopGrounds of, St. Joseph's Convent School, Kotdwar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2019
  • opd: CB, 30 Aug 2019
  • ob: CB, 4 Sep 2019
  • c2+: CB, 26 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast