Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Arthur Green

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port Elizabeth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1915BornJohannesburg
24 Feb 194125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Johannesburg, South Africa
19 Apr 195539.9AppointedBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
29 Jun 195540.1Ordained BishopBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
27 Dec 197055.6ResignedBishop of Port Elizabeth, South Africa
21 Mar 198872.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Port Elizabeth, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Ernest Arthur Green:
Bishop Ernest Arthur Green (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port Elizabeth

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013