Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Raymond Griffith, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1798BornLimerick, Ireland
182122.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Jun 183738.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope {Capo de Buona Speranza}, South Africa
6 Jun 183738.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Pamphylia
24 Aug 183738.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palaeopolis in Pamphylia
30 Jul 184748.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
18 Jun 186263.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Patrick Raymond Griffith:
Bishop Patrick Raymond Griffith O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,266
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013