Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Leonard

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Corada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1829BornDublin, Ireland
5 Jan 185526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
1 Oct 187243.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
1 Oct 187243.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Corada
15 Dec 187243.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corada
19 Feb 190879.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for John Leonard:
Bishop John Leonard (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 181
  • b/c2+: CB, 29 May 2013
  • c34: CB, 31 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,742

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013