Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Grimley

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Antigonea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1821BornKerries, Ireland
6 Jun 184624.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 186039.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
18 Dec 186039.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
25 Jan 186139.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antigonea
18 Jun 186240.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
29 Jan 187149.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Thomas Grimley:
Bishop Thomas Grimley (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013