Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Power

Deceased

Bishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1830Born
4 Jun 185423.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Jun 185423.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 187039.4AppointedBishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
12 Jun 187039.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
4 Dec 189362.9DiedBishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Power
Bishop Thomas Joseph Power (born , died ) Bishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew Ross, Diocese of Ferns, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte Agathe des Irlandais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017