Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Miller, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Transvaal

Titular Bishop of Eumenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1858BornMountrath, Ireland
24 Apr 188122.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
17 Sep 190446.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Transvaal, South Africa
17 Sep 190446.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
20 Nov 190446.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia
2 May 191253.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Transvaal, South Africa
9 Nov 192769.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Transvaal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for William Miller:
Bishop William Miller O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Transvaal

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013