Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Stanislaus von Krolikowski, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Prefect of Great Namaqualand, Namibia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1866Born
5 Feb 189124.2ProfessedMember of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
9 Nov 189225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
191043.1AppointedPrefect of Great Namaqualand, Namibia
21 Jan 192356.1DiedPrefect of Great Namaqualand, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Stanislaus von Krolikowski
Father Stanislaus von Krolikowski O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Prefect of Great Namaqualand

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLviv

  • a priest for 30.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast