Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Mattias Eder, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Great Namaqualand, Namibia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1892Born
27 Sep 191119.7ProfessedMember of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
7 Apr 191523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
16 Mar 192331.2AppointedPrefect of Great Namaqualand, Namibia
193038.0ResignedPrefect of Great Namaqualand, Namibia
18 Jan 195664.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Great Namaqualand, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Mattias Eder
Father Mattias Eder O.S.F.S. (born 1892, died ) Prefect Emeritus of Great Namaqualand

EventPlace
Birth PlacePennewang, Austria

  • a priest for 40.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018