Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Louis Flaherty

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA

Titular Bishop of Tabuda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1910Born
8 Dec 193626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
8 Aug 196656.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
8 Aug 196656.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabuda
15 Oct 196656.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabuda
9 Aug 197565.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for James Louis Flaherty
Bishop James Louis Flaherty (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Richmond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorfolk

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018