Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Stanislaus Waters

Deceased

Bishop of Raleigh, North Carolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1904BornRoanoke, VA
8 Dec 193127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Richmond, Virginia, USA
10 Mar 194540.6AppointedBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
15 May 194540.8Ordained BishopBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
15 Jun 194540.8InstalledBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
3 Dec 197470.3DiedBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Vincent Stanislaus Waters:
Bishop Vincent Stanislaus Waters (born , died ) Bishop of Raleigh

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013