Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Lennox Federal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Salt Lake City, Utah


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1910BornGreensboro, NC
8 Dec 193424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
5 Feb 195141.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
5 Feb 195141.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Appiaria
11 Apr 195141.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appiaria
8 May 195848.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA
31 Mar 196050.2SucceededBishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA
22 Apr 198070.3RetiredBishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA
31 Aug 200090.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lennox Federal:
Bishop Joseph Lennox Federal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Salt Lake City

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 49.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013