Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmet Michael Walsh

Deceased

Bishop of Youngstown, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1892BornBeaufort
15 Jan 191623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Savannah, Georgia, USA
20 Jun 192735.3AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
8 Sep 192735.5Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
8 Sep 194957.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
8 Sep 194957.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhaedestus
16 Nov 195260.7SucceededBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA
16 Mar 196876.0DiedBishop of Youngstown, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Emmet Michael Walsh:
Bishop Emmet Michael Walsh (born , died ) Bishop of Youngstown

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013