Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Joseph Hafey

Deceased

Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1888BornSpringfield, MA
16 Jun 191426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
6 Apr 192537.0AppointedBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
24 Jun 192537.3Ordained BishopBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
22 Sep 193749.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Sep 193749.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Appia
25 Mar 193850.0SucceededBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
12 May 195466.1DiedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Hafey:
Bishop William Joseph Hafey (born , died ) Bishop of Scranton

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013