Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Mary O’Leary

Deceased

Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1875Born
18 Dec 189722.3Ordained PriestPriest of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
16 Jun 192145.8AppointedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
8 Sep 192146.0Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
10 Oct 194974.1DiedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Mary O’Leary
Bishop Thomas Mary O’Leary (born , died ) Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDover, NH

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1921, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast