Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arthur Alfred Sinnott

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada

Titular Archbishop of Sebastea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1877Born
18 Feb 190022.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 191538.7AppointedArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
21 Sep 191639.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
24 Dec 191639.8InstalledArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
14 Jan 195274.8RetiredArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
14 Jan 195274.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
18 Apr 195477.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Arthur Alfred Sinnott
Archbishop Arthur Alfred Sinnott (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Winnipeg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrapaud

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,916, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast