Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Aloysius Rice, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Belize

Titular Bishop of Rusicade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1891Born
27 Aug 192533.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
19 Nov 193847.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Belize
19 Nov 193847.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusicade
16 Apr 193947.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusicade
4 Mar 194654.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Belize

MicroData Summary for William Aloysius Rice
Bishop William Aloysius Rice S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Belize

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFramingham, MA, USA

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018