Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Aldo (Thomas) Donato

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey

Titular Bishop of Jamestown


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1940BornJersey City
29 May 196524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
21 May 200463.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
21 May 200463.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Jamestown
4 Aug 200463.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Jamestown
25 Aug 201574.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Aldo (Thomas) Donato:
Bishop Gaetano Aldo (Thomas) Donato (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Newark

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,665
  • d: CB, 26 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015