Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Anthony DiMarzio

Bishop of Brooklyn, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1944 BornNewark
30 May 197025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
10 Sep 199652.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
10 Sep 199652.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauriana
31 Oct 199652.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauriana
7 Jun 199954.9AppointedBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
22 Jul 199955.0InstalledBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
1 Aug 200359.1AppointedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
3 Oct 200359.2InstalledBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Anthony DiMarzio:
Bishop Nicholas Anthony DiMarzio (born ) Bishop of Brooklyn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brooklyn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,863

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 22 May 2015