Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Francis Chappetto

Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York

Titular Bishop of Citium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1945 BornAstoria, NY
29 May 197125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
2 May 201266.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
2 May 201266.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Citium
11 Jul 201266.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citium

MicroData Summary for Raymond Francis Chappetto:
Bishop Raymond Francis Chappetto (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brooklyn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 May 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 2 May 2012
  • c1: Website of the Diocese, 2 May 2012
  • c34: CB, 9 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,500

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013