Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zanoni Demettino Castro

Archbishop of Feira de Santana, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1962 BornVitória da Conquista
28 Dec 198624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil
3 Oct 200745.6AppointedBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
24 Nov 200745.8Ordained BishopBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
15 Dec 200745.8InstalledBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
3 Dec 201452.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Feira de Santana, Bahia, Brazil
18 Nov 201553.8SucceededArchbishop of Feira de Santana, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Zanoni Demettino Castro:
Archbishop Zanoni Demettino Castro (born ) Archbishop of Feira de Santana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Feira de Santana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,565
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2014
  • s: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015