Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião Roque Rabelo Mendes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Ploaghe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1929Born
8 Dec 195425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Aug 198555.8AppointedBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Nov 198556.0Ordained BishopBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 May 198959.5ResignedBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 May 198959.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 May 198959.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ploaghe
15 Dec 200475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Mar 202090.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Roque Rabelo Mendes
Bishop Sebastião Roque Rabelo Mendes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItapecerica, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais
Death PlaceMadre Teresa, Hospital, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais
Buried Place (Original)São Bento, Church, Itapecerica, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d/c1: CB, 11 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 10 Jun 2020

Quantcast