Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Modesto Augusto Vieira

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Archelaïs


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1865Born
11 May 189024.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 191145.4AppointedBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
25 Jul 191246.6Ordained BishopBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
12 Jan 191448.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Jan 191448.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Archelaïs
27 Sep 191650.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Modesto Augusto Vieira
Bishop Modesto Augusto Vieira (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mariana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrumado do Matto Dentro

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,912, Number 50
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 48, and Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast