Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vital Maria Gonçalves de Oliveira, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1844³Born
2 Aug 186824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Nov 187127.2SelectedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
22 Dec 187127.4ConfirmedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
17 Mar 187227.6Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
4 Jul 187833.9DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vital Maria Gonçalves de Oliveira (VIAF: 74912663)
Bishop Vital Maria Gonçalves de Oliveira O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

EventPlace
Birth PlacePedras de Fogo
Ordained BishopCathedral, São Paulo, Diocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 9.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 424
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017