Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nilus Nicholas Savaryn, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1905Born
3 Jul 192419.1ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
14 Sep 193025.3Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
23 Aug 193126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
3 Apr 194337.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Canada (Ukrainian)
3 Apr 194337.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ios
1 Jul 194338.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ios
19 Jan 194842.6AppointedApostolic Exarch of Western Canada (Ukrainian)
3 Nov 195651.4AppointedBishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada
8 Jan 198680.6DiedBishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Nilus Nicholas Savaryn
Bishop Nilus Nicholas Savaryn O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Edmonton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStary Sambir, Ukraine

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 40
  • prof: CB, 25 Feb 2015
  • c1: CB, 29 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018