Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Victor Chmilar

Bishop of Toronto (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1945 BornLamont
17 Nov 196823.5ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
11 Jun 197227.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
199145.6IncardinatedPriest of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
3 May 200357.9AppointedBishop of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
23 Jul 200358.2Ordained BishopBishop of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Stephen Victor Chmilar:
Bishop Stephen Victor Chmilar (born ) Bishop of Toronto

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Toronto (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,429

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013