Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius John Pasichny, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1927Born
12 Sep 194215.4EnteredMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
14 Jul 194417.2ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
31 Oct 194821.5Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
5 Jul 195326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
6 Nov 199568.6AppointedBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
17 Jan 199668.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
1 Jul 199871.2AppointedBishop of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
3 May 200376.1RetiredBishop of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
30 Jan 201486.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Cornelius John Pasichny
Bishop Cornelius John Pasichny O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWinnipeg

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,658
  • d: CB, 31 Jan 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ente/prof: CB, 26 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018