Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severian Stefan Yakymyshyn, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1930Born
21 Nov 194616.5ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 Jan 195322.6Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
19 May 195525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
5 Jan 199564.7AppointedBishop of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada
25 Mar 199564.9Ordained BishopBishop of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada
1 Jun 200777.1RetiredBishop of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada
6 Sep 202191.3DiedBishop Emeritus of New Westminster (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Severian Stefan Yakymyshyn
Bishop Severian Stefan Yakymyshyn O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of New Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlain Lake
Ordained BishopProtection de Marie, Church, Vancouver
Death PlaceVancouver

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,500
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • sole: CB, 11 Jan 2015
  • prof: CB, 4 Jun 2015
  • d: CB, 7 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast