Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidore Borecky

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Toronto (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1911BornOstrovec, Poland
17 Jul 193826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Canada (Ukrainian)
17 Jan 194836.2AppointedApostolic Exarch of Eastern Canada (Ukrainian)
17 Jan 194836.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
27 May 194836.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
3 Nov 195645.0AppointedBishop of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
16 Jun 199886.7RetiredBishop of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
23 Jul 200391.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Isidore Borecky:
Bishop Isidore Borecky (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Toronto

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 55.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 55
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • c1/opd: CB, 12 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015