Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stepan Chmil, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1914BornSudova Vyshnya, Ukraine
16 Aug 193520.8ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
14 Oct 194531.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Apr 197762.4Ordained BishopBishop
22 Jan 197863.2DiedBishop

MicroData Summary for Stepan Chmil:
Bishop Stepan Chmil S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of (unknown)

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,626
  • bp/prof/c1/d: CB, 5 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 6 Mar 2015